MD SB522 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board; providing for the composition, appointment, and terms of the Board members; providing for a chair of the Board and the establishment of committees; prohibiting Board members from receiving compensation but entitling Board members to reimbursement for specified expenses; providing for the powers and duties of the Board; authorizing the Board to apply, accept, and expend specified gifts, appropriations, or grants; etc.
Title
Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Brinkley) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Recommit to Committee (Conway J) Adopted (26-15) (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Brinkley) Adopted (26-17) (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Brinkley) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Recommit to Committee (Conway J) Adopted (26-15) (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Brinkley) Adopted (26-17) (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Withdrawn |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (16-28) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {543722/1 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (26-15) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted (26-17) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {514431/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Frederick County
Higher Education
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Frederick County
Higher Education
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment