MD SB527 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Garrett County a Class B beer license for specified hotels, motels, inns, and restaurants; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license with or without a catering option; specifying the privileges of a license with and without the catering option; requiring that to exercise the catering option, a holder of a license meet specified requirements; specifying license fees; and authorizing the Board to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Garrett County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Garrett County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations