MD SB530 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which Cecil County is required to file a certain financial report with the Department of Legislative Services.
Title
Cecil County – Annual Financial Report – Filing Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1510 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 16 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |