MD SB534 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing eligibility for a county board of education to receive a specified State grant; requiring a specified grant to be provided to eligible county boards in fiscal years 2015 through 2017 if the full-time enrollment is less than 5,000, less in the current fiscal year than in the prior fiscal year, and total direct education aid in the current fiscal year is less than the prior fiscal year by more than 1%; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the impact of declining enrollment on small school districts be reviewed; etc.
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Small and Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsors
Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Joseph Getty [R] |
Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305268/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means) |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2014-03-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {529231/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Aid
Students
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Aid
Students