MD SB54 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which an artificial or natural flavoring, other than tobacco, is added to impart a particular aroma or taste; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2020-02-13SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-17SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-09-23SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation7213(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7214(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback