MD SB547 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering terms related to the authority to sell draft beer in Garrett County; altering a hearing requirement for the issuance of a certain license in Garrett County; authorizing certain license holders to cater functions on their premises; repealing a prohibition of the issuance of certain licenses in Garrett County to applicants who had not met certain standards; repealing a prohibition of the issuance of certain licenses in Garrett County to a person that holds an out-of-state alcoholic beverages license; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Ex-Offenders
Food
Garrett County
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Notices
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Ex-Offenders
Food
Garrett County
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Notices