MD SB554 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that specified enhanced financial disclosure requirements for elected municipal officials apply only to municipal corporations that have a population exceeding 10,000 persons; and clarifying the application of specified local financial disclosure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics - Financial Disclosure - Local Officials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-28 Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
2012-02-22 Hearing cancelled
2012-02-15 Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-03 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback