MD SB554 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that when an individual becomes eligible for release from State or local custody, a law enforcement or any other government official may not continue to detain the individual on the basis of an immigration detainer; providing that a detainee may not be denied bail solely because of an immigration detainer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-27SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-18SenateHearing cancelled
2014-03-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback