MD SB579 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a Class 8 farm brewery manufacturer's license; specifying an annual fee for the license; authorizing a licensee to sell and deliver beer manufactured in a facility on the licensed farm or in another facility to specified persons; requiring that the beer be manufactured in a specified manner; specifying the privileges that may be exercised by a licensee, including providing samples of beer, selling foods, storing beer, and brewing and bottling beer; authorizing a licensee to sponsor special activities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Brewery Manufacturer's License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-31 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
2012-03-30 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-30 Favorable with Amendments 923095/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-04 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2012-04-03 Re-referred Economic Matters
2012-03-29 Hearing cancelled
2012-03-14 Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-09 First Reading Health and Government Operations
2012-04-01 Passed Enrolled
2012-04-01 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-04-01 Senate Concur - House Amendment
2012-03-09 Third Reading Passed (45-0)
2012-03-07 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-07 Favorable with Amendments 134130/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-06 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-02-08 Hearing 2/24 at 1:15 p.m.
2012-02-03 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback