MD SB590 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that for a specified amount of income distributed to specified members of an S corporation, specified partnerships, a limited liability company, or specified trusts, the State income tax rate is 2.875% and the county income tax rate may not exceed 1.6%; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |