MD SB592 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Allegany County and of a municipal corporation in Allegany County to grant a property tax credit against the county and municipal corporation property tax imposed on specified property owned by specified organizations; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to all taxable years beginning on or after June 30, 2016.
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {649439/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |