MD SB594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor, in specified fiscal years, to include an appropriation in the State budget for the Organic Agriculture Development Fund for specified purposes; extending the termination date for the Maryland Organic Transition Investment Pilot Program from July 1, 2012, to July 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Organic Transition Investment Pilot Program - Funding and Extension of
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0594.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0594f.pdf |