MD SB600 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $250,000 to $375,000, the amount the Chesapeake Bay Trust is required to receive each fiscal year from the Environmental Trust Fund for funding energy conservation projects through the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Trust, to report to the General Assembly on the feasibility of establishing a specified donation program for the benefit of the Chesapeake Bay Trust to which E-ZPass account holders may donate; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-6) (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-6) (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Delegates Holmes, Gilchrist, and O'Donnell |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Waugh |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-6) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {370411/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Chesapeake Bay
Commuters
Conservation
Environmental Trust
Estates and Trusts
Gifts
Natural Resources - Generally
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Chesapeake Bay
Commuters
Conservation
Environmental Trust
Estates and Trusts
Gifts
Natural Resources - Generally
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally