MD SB637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Therapeutic Child Care Program to provide specialized child care and early childhood education by educators, early intervention providers, mental health providers, and health care providers to children under the age of 6 years who have delays in development, physical disabilities, or delays in social, emotional, or behavioral functioning; and requiring the Governor to include in the fiscal year 2022 budget an appropriation to the Program of not less than $45,000 for each child served; etc.
Title
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {269335/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Age
Appropriations
Autism Spectrum
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Consumer Price Index
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Health
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Revenue and Taxes
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Appropriations
Autism Spectrum
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Consumer Price Index
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Health
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Revenue and Taxes
Special Education
Students
Teachers