MD SB644 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB908
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of General Services, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, to study the feasibility and impacts of establishing a State procurement preference for businesses located in historically underutilized business zones.
Title
Department of General Services - Study on Procurement Preferences for Businesses in Historically Underutilized Business Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493320/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB644 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Fines
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Women
Zoning and Planning
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Fines
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Women
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |