MD SB654 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipality to provide, by law, the minimum number of years, not to exceed 40 years, that an elderly individual must live in the same dwelling in order to be eligible for a certain statewide optional property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-28SenateFloor Amendment {863521/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2019-02-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {479634/2 Report Adopted
2019-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0654&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0654f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0654t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_333_sb0654t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0654_47963402.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0654_86352101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0654.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0654_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0360.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0654_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback