MD SB671 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Resources, on a showing by an applicant for long-term Medicaid benefits that the applicant has been unable to obtain from a specified fiduciary institution financial records related to financial and real property assets necessary to establish the applicant's eligibility or ineligibility for public assistance, to request and obtain the records; requiring the Department to adopt regulations stating the requirements an applicant must satisfy for the Department to request financial records; etc.
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {877379/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Fiduciaries
Financial Institutions
Human Resources, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Welfare
Financial Institutions
Human Resources, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Real Property
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Welfare