MD SB678 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; altering the exemption from execution on a judgment for specified items necessary for the practice of any trade or profession; altering the exemption from execution on a judgment for specified items that are held primarily for personal, family, or household use; etc.
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attachments and Garnishments
Cemeteries
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Equipment
Judgments
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Cemeteries
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Equipment
Judgments
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation