MD SB689 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensed motor vehicle dealer to issue a temporary registration plate to a vehicle buyer who is subject to a penalty for lapsed security for another vehicle; and establishing an exception for specified vehicles to the prohibition against the Motor Vehicle Administration issuing a new registration if the vehicle owner is subject to a penalty for lapsed security.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealers - Issuance of Temporary Registration Plate - Lapsed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration