MD SB689 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning within the Department of Education; requiring the Department to provide staff for the Council; establishing the mission of the Council; identifying the membership of the Council; establishing the membership term; requiring the State Superintendent or the Governor to appoint a member in the event of a vacancy; requiring the Council members to elect the Council chair; requiring the Council to submit a report and recommendations on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Title
Education - Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 314938/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 314938/1 | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Reports
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Textbooks
Education
Education, State Department of
Reports
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Textbooks