MD SB694 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a credit card processor from assessing or charging a fee, fine, or penalty that exceeds $500 if a business entity cancels a merchant processing agreement, or any fee, fine, or penalty if a business entity terminates a merchant processing agreement after the expiration of the initial term; requiring a merchant processing agreement to include certain information; requiring that certain information be provided in a certain manner in a merchant processing agreement; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {613894/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {657275/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0694&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0694f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0694t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0694e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0694_65727501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0694_61389401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0694.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0694_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0589.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0694_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0931.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback