MD SB698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition against a community care retirement community provider, subscriber, or group of subscribers being represented by counsel during a certain mediation procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-25HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback