MD SB7 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a driver who is approaching a traffic control signal with no visible lighted indication to reduce speed and prepare to yield to other vehicles in or approaching the intersection under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Nonfunctioning Traffic Control Signals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2012-01-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-06 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-09-01 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0007.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0007f.pdf |