MD SB705 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a carrier from including in a dental provider contract a provision that requires a dental provider to provide specified services at a fee set by the carrier; and applying the Act to dental provider contracts issued, renewed, or amended in the State on or after October 1, 2011.
Title
Health Insurance - Dental Provider Contracts - Prohibited Provision
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |