MD SB733 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that an amendment to the Internal Revenue Code be enacted during the calendar year in which the taxable year that the amendment affects begins in order for the amendment not to impact the determination of Maryland taxable income; allowing an individual to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income whether or not the individual itemizes deductions on the individual's federal tax return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Protecting Maryland Taxpayers Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |