MD SB74 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement for applicants for and recipients of the Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship to file for federal and State financial aid each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/16 at 3:30 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-10-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback