MD SB741 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before June 1, 2021, the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration with local health departments of the State and the Maryland State Department of Education, to adopt and implement a 2-year plan to respond to the outbreak of COVID-19; requiring the plan to address the disproportionate impact of the pandemic on underserved and minority communities in the State; establishing the Maryland Public Health Modernization Workgroup to assess the current public health infrastructure and resources in the State; etc.
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 693325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 173527/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 693325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 173527/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-30) |
2021-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (38-94) |
2021-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment {173527/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (41-92) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {516287/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {787672/1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {787672/1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB836 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assisted Living
Budgets
Chemical Tests
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
COVID-19
Demographics
Education
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Home Care Services
Immunization
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
pandemics
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Assisted Living
Budgets
Chemical Tests
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
COVID-19
Demographics
Education
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Home Care Services
Immunization
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
pandemics
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 16 | 201.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 14C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 14C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1814 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 856 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |