MD SB752 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member or an ex officio member of the Workgroup from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to obtain certain information and recommendations, meet on a certain schedule, and conduct reviews of certain fire and explosion investigations performed by certain public agencies; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Investigations and Inquiries
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Investigations and Inquiries
Public Safety
Records
Reports