MD SB755 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a specified provision of law relating to campaign finance entities does not apply to candidates for election to the central committee of a political party if the candidate during an election cycle does not spend more than $1,000 in personal funds or accept contributions; requiring specified candidates for election to the central committee of a political party to keep a specified account book, preserve the account book for specified purposes and for a specified period of time, and file a specified affidavit; etc.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-08 | House | Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {565868/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Citations
Court Costs
District Courts
Elections
Fees
Judgments
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Process Serving
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Prosecutor
State's Attorneys
Trials
Citations
Court Costs
District Courts
Elections
Fees
Judgments
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Process Serving
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Prosecutor
State's Attorneys
Trials