MD SB774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the entities required to submit a certain report relating to restrictive housing; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to submit certain information from each correctional unit in a report to the General Assembly; prohibiting a correctional unit from placing a minor in restrictive housing unless there is clear and convincing evidence that certain conditions exist; requiring that a minor in restrictive housing be provided certain conditions and privileges; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-17) (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (121-17)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Moon, D.M. Davis, and Malone
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Hough, Washington, and Waldstreicher
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {562013/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {188677/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0774&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0774f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0774t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0774e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_527_sb0774e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0774_18867701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0774_56201301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0774_16322901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0774_71312901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0774.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0774_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0657.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0774_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1187.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0774_71312901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1341.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1554.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback