MD SB780 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Labor to develop certain mandatory, rather than voluntary, guidelines for employers faced with a reduction in operations; altering required contents of the guidelines; requiring an employer to provide written notice to certain persons at least 60 days before initiating a reduction in operations; requiring that the notice include certain information and a certain statement; requiring the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to issue a certain order under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment – Economic Stabilization Act – Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 119 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 407
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (91-39)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (119-6)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-15HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (43-2)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {147974/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-04SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1018 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 406

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment11301(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11302(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11303(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11304(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11305(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11306(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback