MD SB787 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Services to develop a Foster Youth Bill of Rights delineating the rights of children in out-of-home placements; and requiring the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Services to provide, at least one time each year, to each child who is at least 13 years old a copy of the Foster Youth Bill of Rights.
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {778577/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |