MD SB796 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Governor's Advisory Board on Homelessness and establishing an Interagency Council on Homelessness; establishing the membership, staffing, chair, quorum, and meeting times of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving specified compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing specified duties of the Council; requiring the Department of Human Resources to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {854866/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {147472/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally