MD SB796 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain members of the State Commission on Kidney Disease from having direct ownership of more than 30%, rather than any, in renal dialysis or kidney transplant centers that do business in the State; and reducing the minimum number of names, from 3 to 2, required to be on certain lists submitted to the Governor by certain organizations from which the Governor will appoint certain members of the Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {836681/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-07SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0796&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0796f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0796t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0796e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_505_sb0796e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0796_83668101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0796.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0796_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0387.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0796_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1241.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1178.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback