MD SB806 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain costs for services provided are eligible to be included in a vehicle's "dealer processing charge"; repealing certain vehicle dealer price disclosure requirements for dealer processing and freight charges; requiring vehicle dealers to disclose the amount of a dealer processing charge in a certain manner and file with the Motor Vehicle Administration certain notice of the amount of a dealer processing charge; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Communications
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Retail Sales
Signs and Billboards
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Retail Sales
Signs and Billboards
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration