MD SB821 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions relating to brewing company, winery, and distillery off-site permits; establishing a manufacturer's off-site permit with certain privileges; authorizing the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to issue a brewery special event permit; altering the volumes of beer that the holders of certain licenses may produce and distribute annually; authorizing holders of certain manufacturer's licenses to sell and deliver products produced under the holder's license to individuals located in the State; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403993/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774733/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1232 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Subjects
Age of Majority
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Delivery Services
Emergency Bills
Excise Tax
Fairs
Fees
Forms
Health
Identification
Job Training
Notices
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sales and Use Tax
Special Events
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Delivery Services
Emergency Bills
Excise Tax
Fairs
Fees
Forms
Health
Identification
Job Training
Notices
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sales and Use Tax
Special Events
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 132.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |