MD SB838 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - First Reading Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - First Reading Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an educational institution from requiring, requesting, suggesting, or causing a student, an applicant, or a prospective student to grant access to, allow observation of, or disclose information that allows access to or observation of the individual's personal electronic account; prohibiting an educational institution from compelling, as a condition of acceptance or participation in specified activities, an individual to add specified individuals to a list of contacts or to change privacy settings; etc.
Title
Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {544638/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Community Colleges
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discipline
Disclosure
District Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Equipment
Fines
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Civil Actions
Community Colleges
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discipline
Disclosure
District Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Equipment
Fines
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology