MD SB839 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting employers who employ 15 or more full-time employees from requiring an applicant for employment, before the first in-person interview, to disclose certain information regarding the criminal record of the applicant except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to conduct an investigation to determine whether the Act has been violated on receipt of a written complaint of an applicant or employee; authorizing the Commissioner to assess a certain civil penalty; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-41) (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-15) (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (97-42)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Wilson, Crosby, and C. Watson
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-02SenateSenators Augustine, Hayes, and Benson
2019-04-02SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-02SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-02SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (99-41)
2019-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {613797/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2019-03-25HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (29-15)
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {103923/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {557979/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateSpecial Order until 3/21 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {557979/1
2019-03-20SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {557979/1
2019-03-19SenateLaid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {557979/1
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07SenateReassigned to Finance
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0839&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0839f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0839t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0839e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_55797901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_10392302.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_61379701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_60382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_13382901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0839.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0839_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0741.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0839_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1078.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0839_13382901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1268.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1511.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/sb0839.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback