MD SB847 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a certain adjustment to the State share percentage for a county library capital project if a county's median household income is in the bottom quartile in the State and the State share percentage for a county library capital project is 50%; etc.
Title
Libraries – Capital Projects – State Share Adjustments
Sponsors
Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463426/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1249 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Poverty
Reports
Weights and Measures
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Poverty
Reports
Weights and Measures