MD SB872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified statewide kindergarten assessment to be limited to a random sample of specified kindergarten students from within specified local school systems in the State; authorizing a specified kindergarten assessment to evaluate specified skills; prohibiting specified standardized tests from being administered to specified prekindergarten students; and requiring the State Department of Education to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students