MD SB888 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013.
Title
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493690/1 Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197479/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disabilities
Diseases
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Disabilities
Diseases
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment