MD SB900 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the authority to adopt certain regulations related to fantasy competitions from the Comptroller to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission; prohibiting a person from operating a kiosk or machine that offers fantasy competition to the public.
Title
Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Regulation and Prohibition on Operation of Electronic Device
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-45) (Y: 88 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 853 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-45) |
2018-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {503126/1 (Delegate Bromwell) Withdrawn |
2018-04-06 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {289334/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |