MD SB913 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to five the number of regular members of the Caroline County Board of Elections; requiring the members of the local board to be of specified political parties; requiring a vacancy on the local board to be filled in a specified manner; increasing the amount of compensation for the president and other regular members of the local board; making the Act effective June 6, 2011; etc.
Title
Caroline County - Board of Elections - Membership and Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading Senate Rules |