MD SB93 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Explicitly stating the power of the Maryland Transportation Authority to conduct or coordinate a study of the environmental impact of a proposed transportation facility; requiring the Authority, in collaboration with specified other agencies, to commence the process, on or before January 1, 2014, to conduct and complete an Environmental Impact Study for a third crossing of the Chesapeake Bay; and requiring that the Environmental Impact Study be for a span at a specified location.
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Chesapeake Bay
Environmental Matters
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Bridges and Tunnels
Chesapeake Bay
Environmental Matters
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Highways