MD SB930 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to accept premiums on an installment payment basis under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to ensure specified provisions of an installment payment plan; prohibiting the Fund from discriminating among insureds in a specified manner; prohibiting the Fund from considering, in determining specified commissions, whether a fund producer placed an insured in an installment payment plan; etc.
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-8) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {757379/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Fees
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Notices
Prices
Reports
Sunset
Disclosure
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Fees
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Notices
Prices
Reports
Sunset