MD SB950 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing any remaining balance in the account of a certain campaign finance entity before its termination to be paid to a certain legislative party caucus committee; requiring the authorized candidate campaign committee of a candidate who dies to pay outstanding obligations, dispose of remaining funds in a certain manner, and terminate and file a final campaign finance report within 1 year after the candidate's death; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 491
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {285867/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {403626/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {964338/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {964338/1
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-27SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0950&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0950f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0950t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0950e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_491_sb0950e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0950_96433801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0950_40362602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0950_28586701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0950.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0950_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0631.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0950_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1434.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1347.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback