MD SB952 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to include, in each contract with a contracted pharmacy, the sources used to determine maximum allowable cost pricing; requiring the pharmacy benefits manager to update its pricing information with a specified frequency and provide a means by which contracted pharmacies may review pricing updates in a specified format; etc.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707073/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Claims
Contracts
Disclosure
Drugs
Equipment
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Claims
Contracts
Disclosure
Drugs
Equipment
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates