MD SB97 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to send a specified notice of a right to appeal if the Department does not render an eligibility determination for a specified applicant within a specified period of time; requiring the Department to render an eligibility determination for a specified applicant at a specified hearing under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to provide a specified applicant with a detailed list of specified information; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility Determinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-17 | Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appeals
Budgets
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Reports
Budgets
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Reports
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0097.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0097f.pdf |