MD SB980 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Comptroller to issue a winery special event permit to a Class 4 Maryland limited winery in Queen Anne's County for unlimited use for 1 day each week at specified farmers' markets in Queen Anne's County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2013-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2013-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-20SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback