MD SB985 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile police records and court records do not prohibit access to and confidential use of certain records concerning a child by the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice if the Office is providing services to the child; specifying that the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice shall be liable for the unauthorized release of a police record it accesses under the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback